This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:05:18 (UTC).

CITIBANK -V- HASSETT

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HASSETT. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5817

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A.

Defendant

CYNTHIA L HASSETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan Street Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2015
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY CYNTHIA L HASSETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DISCHARGE FILED BY CYNTHIA L HASSETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY CYNTHIA L HASSETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • UPDATE DISPOSITION OF CYNTHIA L HASSETT TO BANKRUPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2011
  • SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE CYNTHIA L HASSETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY CYNTHIA L HASSETT; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:11-BK-35232-MJ. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CYNTHIA L HASSETT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA), N.A. AS TO CYNTHIA L HASSETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CYNTHIA L HASSETT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/07/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-3032 $380.00; 110504-3032-CK Reference Number #35143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less