Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/27/2018 at 19:02:04 (UTC).

CINDY MARK REALTY -V- CADENA

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 CINDY MARK REALTY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CADENA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0152

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CINDY MARK REALTY

Defendant

KIM CADENA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KIM CADENA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KIM CADENA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/18/2018 OF CINDY MARK REALTY ORDERED ENTERED 06/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CINDY MARK REALTY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KIM CADENA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KIM CADENA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIM CADENA; PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIM CADENA; PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/22/18 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/22/18 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180518-0141 $255.00; 180518-0141-CK Reference Number 8449

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KIM CADENA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/18/2018 OF CINDY MARK REALTY AS TO KIM CADENA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/18/2018 OF CINDY MARK REALTY ORDERED ENTERED 06/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CINDY MARK REALTY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KIM CADENA; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KIM CADENA. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0247 $25.00; 180605-0247-CK Reference Number 8481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180605-0233 $25.00; 180605-0233-CK Reference Number 8482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KIM CADENA; PARTY SERVED ON 05/22/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/18/2018 OF CINDY MARK REALTY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/22/18 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • 8/27/18 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • 8/27/18 8:01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180518-0141 $255.00; 180518-0141-CK Reference Number 8449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CINDY MARK REALTY is a litigant