This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:11:57 (UTC).

CHU VS MERAZ

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 CHU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MERAZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8229

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOYCE CHU

Defendant

JOHNNY MERAZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAN, KENNY KEAN

640 N Diamond Bar Blvd

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0265 $25.00; 180117-0265-CK Reference Number 4552

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0265 $25.00; 180117-0265-CK Reference Number 4552

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 11/08/2017 OF JOYCE CHU ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: JOYCE CHU; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHNNY MERAZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JOHNNY MERAZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOHNNY MERAZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOHNNY MERAZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHNNY MERAZ FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JOHNNY MERAZ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/02/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/02/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHNNY MERAZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHNNY MERAZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0042 $255.00; 171116-0042-MC Reference Number 0310060620796

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180119-0503 $25.00; 180119-0503-MC Reference Number 031-0078401774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0265 $25.00; 180117-0265-CK Reference Number 4552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • 712 & WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/18 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • PROOFS/RTED/JUDGMENT BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • POS/DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 11/08/2017 OF JOYCE CHU, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/02/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JOHNNY MERAZ; PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOYCE CHU FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0050 $22.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $24.65.--BEGINNING ON 11/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0042 $255.00; 171116-0042-MC Reference Number 0310060620796

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF