This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 15:36:08 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA - EMELY SUYAPA VARELA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA - EMELY SUYAPA VARELA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0975

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA

Respondent

EMELY SUYAPA VARELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KLINEFELTER, MARITZA FLORES

1025 West Arrow Hwy Suite 205

Glendora, CA 91740

Respondent Attorney

ERIC A TORICES ESQ

12139 Paramount Blvd

Downey, CA 90242

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT, DUE TO THE UNAVAILABILITY OF THE COURT, THE HEARING WHICH; IS CURRENTLY SET ON 07-23-18 IS BEING CONTINUED TO 08-08-18 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT S50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER GIGI LEDESMA 8538; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA PRESENT; ATTORNEY MARITZA FLORES KLINEFELTER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: EMELY SUYAPA VARELA; ATTORNEY ERIC TORICES PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); COUNSEL REQUEST MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING); NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JESSICA FLORES; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: L SCOTT; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA, EMELY SUYAPA VARELA; MARITZA FLORES KLINEFELTER FOR CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA NOT PRESENT; ATTORNEY ERIC TORICES OFFICE FOR RESPONDENT MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/21/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FILED BY CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • NOTICE PENDING HEARINGS STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY EMELY SUYAPA VARELA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS MARITZA FLORES KLINEFELTER FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTOPHER HENRY VARELA FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY EMELY SUYAPA VARELA FOR PRELIMINARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESP TO DISSO AND SUPPORT DOCS BY MAIL ON 02/21/17 AS TO CHRISTOPHER H VARELA C/O MARITZA KLINEFELTER, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 02/06/2017 OF CHRISTOPHER VARELA BY EMELY SUYAPA VARELA FILED. REPRESENTED BY ERIC A TORICES ESQ.; Minutes; Receipt: 170303-0128 $435.00; 170303-0128-CK Reference Number 1620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EMELY SUYAPA VARELA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/16/17 WITH COSTS OF $100.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0171 $435.00; 170206-0171-CK Reference Number 1342

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.