This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 09:08:40 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER BRYANT -N- CLARIBEL BRYANT

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 CHRISTOPHER BRYANT -N- CLARIBEL BRYANT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1262

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTOPHER BRYANT

Respondent

CLARIBEL BRYANT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 11/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/25/2017 OF CHRISTOPHER BRYANT FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/25/2017 OF CHRISTOPHER BRYANT ORDERED ENTERED 06/20/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 06/19/17 BY CHRISTOPHER BRYANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTOPHER BRYANT FOR PRELIMINARY,FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CLARIBEL BRYANT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 04/25/2017 OF CHRISTOPHER BRYANT AS TO CLARIBEL BRYANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PETITION/SUMMON S BY CLARIBEL BRYANT WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 05/09/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CLARIBEL BRYANT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHRISTOPHER BRYANT IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHRISTOPHER BRYANT FOR 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTOPHER BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHRISTOPHER BRYANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.