This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 08:06:45 (UTC).

CHRISTMAN-V-THE VAPOUR LOUNGE

Case Summary

On 05/16/2016 CHRISTMAN-V-THE VAPOUR LOUNGE was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7515

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALLAN CHRISTMAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FLAWLESS VAPE SHOP, INC.

THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,

KCAV, INC.

GOKUL JOE AND SAM CORP., A CALIFORNIA

LG CHEM LTD.

GJ'S WHOLESALE

THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOKUL JOE AND SAM CORP.

Cross Defendants

INNOVAPE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LG CHEM, LTD .

VAPOR WHOLESALE & DISTRIBUTION, INC., A

GJ'S WHOLESALE, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM

GOKUL JOE AND SAM CORP.

PERFECTION PEN, LLC

LG CHEM, LTD

K-CAV, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHWARTZBERG & LUTHER

8291 Utica Avenue Suite 201

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

SHERNOFF BIDART ECHEVERRIA BENTLEY LLP

600 South Indian Hill Blvd

Claremont, CA 91711

BENTLEY & MORE, LLP

4 Park Plaza Ste 500

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

COLLINS, COLLINS, MUIR & STEWART

10681 Foothill Blvd Ste 260

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

MURPHY,PEARSON,BRADLEY & FEENEY

550 S. Hope Street Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90017

MCMAHON LYNCH LAW FIRM INC

1250 Corona Pointe Court Suite 407

Corona, CA 92879

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

NOTICE OF RULING ON LG CHEM LTDS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON LG CHEM LTDS MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS FILED.

MOTION RE: TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LG CHEM LTD. (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/15/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LG CHEM LTD. (IMAGED)

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED

ANSWER FILED BY GOKUL JOE AND SAM CORP., A CALIFORNIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCMAHON LYNCH LAW FIRM INC.

ANSWER FILED BY GOKUL JOE AND SAM CORP., A CALIFORNIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCMAHON LYNCH LAW FIRM INC.

ANSWER FILED BY LG CHEM, LTD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY LG CHEM, LTD; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LG CHEM LTD..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FLAWLESS VAPE SHOP,INC..

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY FLAWLESS VAPE SHOP,INC..

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND PERMIT ANSWER FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND PERMIT ANSWER FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT GJ'S WHOLESALE, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO GJ'S WHOLESALE, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM

ANSWER FILED BY LG CHEM, LTD .; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY LG CHEM, LTD .; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/16/2016 OF CALLAN CHRISTMAN BY THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/16/2016 OF CALLAN CHRISTMAN BY THE VAPOUR LOUNGE,

DECLARATION OF JEFF C HSU IN SUPP OF MOT FOR LEAVE TO FILE X-COMP FILED

DECLARATION OF JEFF C HSU IN SUPP OF MOT FOR LEAVE TO FILE X-COMP FILED

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/06/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT THE VAPOUR LOUNGE, (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 04/06/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT THE VAPOUR LOUNGE, (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN & MCKENNA WITH COLLINS, COLLINS, MUIR & STEWART AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR FLAWLESS VAPE SHOP,INC..

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING CARROLL, KELLY, TROTTER, FRANZEN & MCKENNA WITH COLLINS, COLLINS, MUIR & STEWART AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR FLAWLESS VAPE SHOP,INC..

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFO FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFO FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN.

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN FOR FAX FILING FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180806-0154 $5.00; 180806-0154-VS Reference Number 033-0080416086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/16/2016 OF CALLAN CHRISTMAN FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CALLAN CHRISTMAN, ON 07/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT DISMISS AS TO ENTIRE ACTION THERE ARE 3 ACTIVE CROSS-COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S23.

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2016
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR CALLAN CHRISTMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY CALLAN CHRISTMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 05/16/2016 OF CALLAN CHRISTMAN FOR CALLAN CHRISTMAN, ATTORNEY SCHWARTZBERG & LUTHER ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • PARTY CALLAN CHRISTMAN UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.