Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 09:19:37 (UTC).

CHRISTINE M ARCARO -N- JAMES ARCARO

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CHRISTINE M ARCARO -N- JAMES ARCARO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4968

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTINE M ARCARO

Respondent

JAMES ARCARO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO RE: CS/SS (040218); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STEVEN J SINGLEY, JUDGE; CLERK: MYRNA THOMAS; COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER 12512; BAILIFF: B PEDROZA; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHRISTINE M ARCARO PRESENT; ATTORNEY BARBARA MC CLANAHAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; LIMITED SCOPE; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JAMES ARCARO; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- PETITIONER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AS THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO RE: CS/SS (040218); Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STEVEN J SINGLEY, JUDGE; CLERK: MYRNA THOMAS; COURT REPORTER RHIANNON LEATH-SOUZA 14032; BAILIFF: B PEDROZA; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHRISTINE M ARCARO PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JAMES ARCARO; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- PETITIONER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PETITIONER.; REASON: PROOF OF SERVICE NEEDED; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S48.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180511-0197 $5.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO RE: CC/CV (040418); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STEVEN J SINGLEY, JUDGE; CLERK: MYRNA THOMAS; COURT REPORTER THERESA MADRIGAL 8510; BAILIFF: B PEDROZA; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CHRISTINE M ARCARO PRESENT; RESPONDENT JAMES ARCARO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED.; COPIES GIVEN TO PARTIES/COUNSEL.; WRITTEN REPORT RECEIVED FROM CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR B. EVANS-MILES.; REPORT OF CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR IS READ AND CONSIDERED BY THE COURT.; COURT INQUIRES OF THE PARTIES.; THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT.; CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS:; PURSUANT TO ATTACHED RECOMMENDATION; COURT MAKES ORDERS PURSUANT TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT AS ATTACHED AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER.; NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA.; THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.; THE COURT HAS CONSIDERED THE FACTORS SET FORTH IN FAMILY CODE 3048(B)(1) AND FINDS THAT THERE IS NOT A RISK OF ABDUCTION OF THE CHILD BY EITHER PARTY.; A VIOLATION OF THIS CUSTODY ORDER MAY SUBJECT A PARTY FOUND IN VIOLATION TO CIVIL OR CRIMINAL PENALTIES, OR BOTH.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT: S49.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/23/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/14/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINE ARCARO FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINE ARCARO ORDERED ENTERED 04/23/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • JBSIS STAT-CUSTODY AND VISITATION DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINE ARCARO.

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CHRISTINE M ARCARO IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE M ARCARO RE: CC/CV/CS (061217).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S48

    Read MoreRead Less