This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:42:12 (UTC).

CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR TRUST ESTABLISHED DEC 3, 200

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR TRUST ESTABLISHED DEC 3, 200 was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0999

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR

Other

CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR TRUST ESTABLISHED DEC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ANDERSON & LEBLANC, A.P.L.C.

1365 West Foothill Blvd Suite 2

Upland, CA 91786

ORTIZ, DONNASUE

10700 Civic Center Dr Suite 100-C

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ENTIRE FILE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ENTIRE FILE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/16/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/16/18 FILED.

MAILING COVERSHEET 04/16/18 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 04/16/18 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/16/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/16/18 FILED.

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

PETITION RE: TO COMPEL TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO COMPEL TERMINATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • PETITION FOR TO COMPEL TERMINATION OF TRUST; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; RICHARD ANDERSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR.; ATTORNEY DONNASUE ORTIZ (GUARDIAN AD LITEM) PRESENT FOR CHRISTINA SAYLOR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT DENIES PETITION ON THE CURRENT GROUNDS CITED AS THE TERMINATION OF THE CONSERVATORSHP; DOES NOT TERMINATE THE TRUST AND PETITIONER WAS NOT A PART OF THE SETTLEMENT AND THERE IS MORE; THAN ONE BENFICIARY.; AMENDED PETITION TO BE FILED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • REPORT BY COURT APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • HRG OF 07/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • HRG OF 07/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR TRUST FILED BY CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING PREVIOUS ORDERS FILED BY CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF ENTIRE FILE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/16/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 04/16/18 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/05/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 02/05/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NOTICE IS INCOMPLETE PLEASE SEE RED CHECK MARKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTINA HOPE SAYLOR FOR PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0854 $465.00; 171004-0854-CK Reference Number 8763

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: TO COMPEL TERMINATION OF TRUST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less