This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 11:02:55 (UTC).

CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF -N- ALBERT RUF

Case Summary

On 06/12/2017 CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF -N- ALBERT RUF was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1777

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF

Respondent

ALBERT RUF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • SASE X2 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 08/08/17 BY CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF FOR PRELIM/FNL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALBERT RUF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 06/12/2017 OF CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF AS TO ALBERT RUF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ALBERT RUF; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHRISTINA CALDWELL-RUF FOR 1ST APP FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.