This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:25:51 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU -V- LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU -V- LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3089

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU

Respondents

LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY

SUZANNE PHILLIPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KOSNETT LAW FIRM

11355 W Olympic Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Respondent Attorney

CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC

601 S Main St

Corona, CA 92882

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • ORDER AND JUDGMENT DENYING WRIT OF MANDAMUS - FILED; Minutes; RESPONDENTS SHALL RECOVER THEIR COSTS IN THIS ACTION, IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,248.30.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION DENIED; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS, FOR 1248.30.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES KOSNETT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY ROLAND BAINER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU'S MOTION PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS HEARD.; COURT GIVES TENTATIVE RULING.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY THE PLAINTIFF .; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEFENDANT .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; COURT FINDS:; PETITION DENIED; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO PREPARE ORDER AND JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SUBMISSION OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY IF JUDGMENT IS SIGNED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD LODGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE SET FOR HEARING ON 06/29/18 FILED BY CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: *BRIEF* "PETITION/ WRIT OF ADMIN. MANDAMUS" SET FOR HEARING ON 06/29/18, FILED BY DEFENDANT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ROLAND BAINER IN SUPPORT OF ADDENDUM TO ADMIN... FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • RESPONDENTS SUBMISSION ADDENDUM TO ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, DEC OF ROLAND BAINER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • OPENING BRIEF * FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2017
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • ANSWER FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEMURRER FILED BY LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS; REPRESENTED BY CLAYSON, BAINER & SAUNDERS, APLC(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • MOTION RE: TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS FROM PETITION FOR WRIT OF MA SET FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17, FILED BY RESPONDENT LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY, SUZANNE PHILLIPS (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHRISTIAN SAFRO-POKU FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0366 $435.00; 170711-0366-CK Reference Number 2045

    Read MoreRead Less