This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/29/2017 at 07:22:16 (UTC).

Chopra-v-anderson

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Chopra-v-anderson in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2410

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ravi Chopra

Defendant

Patty Anderson

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF UD FILING FOR PATTY ANDERSON RECEIVED BACK FROM US MAIL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY RAVI CHOPRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY RAVI CHOPRA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON RAVI CHOPRA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE/NEW FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $18.33.--BEGINNING ON 10/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less