This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/17/2018 at 11:41:02 (UTC).

CHOI-V-VIRAMONTES

Case Summary

On 12/31/2012 CHOI-V-VIRAMONTES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0624

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNG HEE CHOI

Defendants

GABRIEL VIRAMONTES

LINDSAY VIRAMONTES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JAEHONG CHOI

20955 Pathfinder Rd. Ste 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2013
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LINDSAY VIRAMONTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/31/2012 OF SUNG CHOI AS TO LINDSAY VIRAMONTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST GABRIEL VIRAMONTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/31/2012 OF SUNG CHOI AS TO GABRIEL VIRAMONTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • FILING FEE PAID BY SUNG HEE CHOI FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 130114-0238 $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • PROOF BY FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO LINDSAY VIRAMONTES SERVED ON 01/02/13 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • PROOFS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PROOF STATES PERSONAL SERVICE PLEASE REVIEW AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GABRIEL VIRAMONTES; PARTY SERVED ON 01/02/13 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 121231-1638 $255.00; 121231-1638-CK Reference Number 1440

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.