This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:15:59 (UTC).

CHO-v-ALDERMAN, ETAL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CHO-v-ALDERMAN, ETAL was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1560

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HYUN S CHO

Defendants

TRAVIS DICKIN

JAMES ALDERMAN

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF HYUN CHO ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HYUN S CHO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/13/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/13/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JAMES ALDERMAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JAMES ALDERMAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TRAVIS DICKIN SERVED ON 07/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TRAVIS DICKIN SERVED ON 07/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • CONFORMED COPIES IN THE ATTORNEY BIN -- NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170802-0310 $25.00; 170802-0310-CK Reference Number 6450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF HYUN CHO ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: HYUN S CHO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/13/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF HYUN CHO AS TO JAMES ALDERMAN, TRAVIS DICKIN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JAMES ALDERMAN; PARTY SERVED ON 07/13/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO TRAVIS DICKIN SERVED ON 07/13/17 WITH COSTS OF $45.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF HYUN CHO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HYUN S CHO FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0692 $255.00; 170711-0692-VS Reference Number 026-0056603517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $15.83.--BEGINNING ON 06/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less