This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:49:57 (UTC).

CHI FAI CHAN -V- GREEN TOWER, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CHI FAI CHAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GREEN TOWER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9619

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHI FAI CHAN

Defendants

GREEN TOWER, INC.

HEYING YU

YULING HAN

GUANG WEN LIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CHARLENE BAILLIE

40335 Winchester Rd #E-512

Temecula, CA 92591

Defendant Attorney

AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP

3733 Rosemead Blvd Suite 201

Rosemead, CA 91770

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GREEN TOWER, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GREEN TOWER, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY GUANG WEN LIANG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY GUANG WEN LIANG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY GREEN TOWER, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY GREEN TOWER, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; THE PROOF OF SERVICES OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ARE BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS. IF; SERVING BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE PLEASE PROVIDED A DECLATION OF DUE DILIGENCE AND A DECLARATION OF; MAILINGTHE DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE MUST HAVE AT LEAST 3 SERVICE ATTEMPTS. THANK YOU

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUANG WEN LIANG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUANG WEN LIANG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUANG WEN LIANG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GUANG WEN LIANG; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; (CLERKS CALENDAR HELD); CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; CHARLENE BAILLIE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHI FAI CHAN.; CINDY NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GREEN TOWER, INC., GUANG WEN LIANG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REPORTS THAT WRITTEN DISCOVERY IS UNDERWAY AND MORE IS ANTICIPATED.; COUNSEL FURTHER ADVISES THAT ADR HAS NOT BEEN ENTERTAINED HOWEVER PLAINTIFF IS AMENABLE TO; COURT SPONSORED OR PRIVATE MEDIATION, HOWEVER COUNSEL IS CONCERNED THAT COURT SPONSORED; MEDIATION WILL NOT AFFORD HER CLIENT ENOUGH TIME BECAUSE AN INTERPRETER WILL BE NEEDED.; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT REPORTS HER CLIENT WOULD ALSO BE AMENABLE TO PRIVATE MEDIATION. COUNSEL; IS INVITED TO CONTACT JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO SCHEDULE A MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE,; SHOULD PRIVATE MEDIATION BE UNSUCCESSFUL.; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: VANESKA DIEDERICH; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY CHARLENE BAILLIE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY CINDY NGUYEN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GREEN TOWER, INC., GUANG WEN LIANG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; HEARING CONTINUED FOR THE PURPOSES OF DISCOVERY.; COUNSEL WILL HAVE DISCUSSIONS REGARDING ADR.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL REPRESENTS THEY ARE STILL IN THE PROCESS OF SERVING DEFENDANT YU AND; DEFENDANT HAN.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/13/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GREEN TOWER, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY GUANG WEN LIANG; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DEFENDANT GUANG WEN LIANG FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GUANG WEN LIANG FOR FAX, FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 171222-0451 $457.00; 171222-0451-VS Reference Number 07496G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DEFENDANT GREEN TOWER, INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY GREEN TOWER, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AMITY LAW GROUP, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GREEN TOWER, INC. FOR FIRST APP; Minutes; Receipt: 171222-0439 $435.00; 171222-0439-VS Reference Number 08564G

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CHI FAI CHAN FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0036352920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHI FAI CHAN FOR FAX/POST/ENVLP/COPIES FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0093 $53.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHI FAI CHAN FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0089 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less