This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 02:07:58 (UTC).

CHERYL L. CHAVEZ -N- JORGE A. CHAVEZ

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 CHERYL L CHAVEZ -N- JORGE A CHAVEZ was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8609

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHERYL L CHAVEZ

Respondent

JORGE A CHAVEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2022
  • HEARING OSC DISMISSAL OF ACTION/FAILURE TO TRIAL (5 YEARS).; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NEJ MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • VACATE HFAIL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/22 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 04/20/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • CASE RESOLUTION STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: CHERI CLARK; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; BAILIFF: M LOZANO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: CHERYL L CHAVEZ, JORGE A CHAVEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL); HEARING ON: CASE RESOLUTION; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: JUDGMENT SUBMITTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF CHERYL CHAVEZ FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF CHERYL CHAVEZ ORDERED ENTERED 03/16/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JORGE A CHAVEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JORGE A CHAVEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 10/04/2017 OF CHERYL CHAVEZ AS TO JORGE A CHAVEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHERYL L CHAVEZ FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • VACATE SPOS HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CHERYL L CHAVEZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHERYL L CHAVEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CHERYL L CHAVEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHERYL L CHAVEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less