Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 17:47:12 (UTC).

CHEN -V- CASAS

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 CHEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1583

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROY CHEN

Defendants

LISA MARIE MIRANDA

GILBERT CASAS JR

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN. (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN. (IMAGED)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ROY CHEN REPRESENTED BY ROSE RIKE.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ROSE RIKE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF ROY CHEN ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROY CHEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,150.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $2,709.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,724.60; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/30/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/30/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 03/30/17 AS TO UNKNOWNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 03/30/17 AS TO UNKNOWNS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LISA MARIE MIRANDA WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LISA MARIE MIRANDA WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LISA MARIE MIRANDA WITH COSTS OF $0.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LISA MARIE MIRANDA WITH COSTS OF $0.00

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GILBERT CASAS JR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GILBERT CASAS JR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/30/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/30/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GILBERT CASAS JR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/30/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GILBERT CASAS JR; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/30/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • UNDELIVERED: NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ROY CHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY BARRY OCONNOR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ROY CHEN REPRESENTED BY ROSE RIKE.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:57; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ROSE RIKE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF ROY CHEN ORDERED ENTERED 04/21/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ROY CHEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,150.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $2,709.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,724.60; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: GILBERT CASAS JR, LISA MARIE MIRANDA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON GILBERT CASAS JR; PARTY SERVED ON 03/30/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ROY CHEN FOR SUMMONS/COMPLAINT IN THE AMOUNT OF $255.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROY CHEN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ROY CHEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $3,150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.87.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less