This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 21:30:57 (UTC).

CHASE BANK -V- ACEDO

Case Summary

On 06/18/2010 CHASE BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ACEDO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0401

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHASE BANK USA, N.A.

Defendant

JEANNIE H ACEDO

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, RORY W CLARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/22/2011

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2011

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2010

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2010

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2010

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2010

DocketNotice Filed Re:; Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND POS FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2010

DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2010

DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2010

DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed; Comment: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING JP MORGAN CHASE LEGAL DEPARTMENT WITH RORY CLARK AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CHASE BANK USA, N.A..

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
07/07/2010

DocketProof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUM/COMP ADR NTC/ASSIGN NTC/OSC NTC/STATUS FILED AS TO JEANNIE H ACEDO. PARTY SERVED ON 06/29/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $74.50.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2010

DocketVacate Hearing Scheduled; Comment: VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/30/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B3.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20100618-0868; ConversionPayment; $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $220.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $440.00; Total Payments and Credits: $440.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2010

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 100618-0868-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT 100618-0868-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 628531

[+] Read More [-] Read Less