This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/02/2018 at 20:45:06 (UTC).

CHARTER'S VS CORNELIUS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2010 CHARTER'S filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORNELIUS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3143

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION

Defendant

ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE 051011 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE 051011 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110510-0813 $25.00; 110510-0813-CK Reference Number 3265

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $58.65), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $58.65), AND

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE FROM DEFENDANT STATING HE IS NOT THE CORREC T PERSON AND NEVER HAD DEALINGS WITH PLAINTIFF. PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

NOTICE FROM DEFENDANT STATING HE IS NOT THE CORREC T PERSON AND NEVER HAD DEALINGS WITH PLAINTIFF. PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/23/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/23/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 101217-0117 $50.00; 101217-0117-CK Reference Number 2683

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM LA COUNTY, BUT ONLY WRIT IN FILE ISSUED TO SB COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED IN SASE 051011 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110510-0813 $25.00; 110510-0813-CK Reference Number 3265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $58.65), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 110407-4101 $25.00; 110407-4101-CK Reference Number 3138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION REPRESENTED BY STEVE EIDE.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; 02:12; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; STEVE EIDE IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,362.27 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $175.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,537.27; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE FROM DEFENDANT STATING HE IS NOT THE CORREC T PERSON AND NEVER HAD DEALINGS WITH PLAINTIFF. PLACED IN FILE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ANDREW J CORNELIUS JR. PARTY SERVED ON 12/23/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $125.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 101217-0117 $50.00; 101217-0117-CK Reference Number 2683

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHARTER'S VILLAGE GREEN OWNERSASSOCIATION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.