This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:43:46 (UTC).

CHARLES L HARDWAY

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 CHARLES L HARDWAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1008

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELLY HARDWAY

Decedent

CHARLES L HARDWAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KAYSER PAHORATTORNEYS, LLP

1407 N. Batavia Street Suite 103

Orange, CA 92867

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 12/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: OF ORIGINAL WILL LODGED FILED.

RECEIPT RE: OF ORIGINAL WILL LODGED FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/04/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/04/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

DECLINATION TO ACT AS EXECUTOR FILED.

DECLINATION TO ACT AS EXECUTOR FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED, KELLY HARDWAY APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND FIXED AT $75,000.00, JAMES SMOTHERS APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED KELLY HARDWAY IN THE AMT OF 75,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 12/04/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KELLY HARDWAY FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0481 $465.00; 171006-0481-CK Reference Number #1114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KELLY HARDWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLINATION TO ACT AS EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less