This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 05:47:10 (UTC).

CHARLES HILL -V- SHERRY HILL

Case Summary

On 11/05/2010 CHARLES HILL filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against SHERRY HILL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARLES HILL

Respondent

SHERRY HILL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2011

DocketHAND DELIVERED TO PETITIONER CHARLES HILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketJUDGEMENT & NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketFAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 11/05/2010 OF CHARLES HILL FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2011

DocketDEFAULT HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; R GLENN YABUNO, JUDGE; CLERK: BEBEANNA FLETCHER; COURT REPORTER IRV C SCHEIBE 1237; BAILIFF: D SMITH; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHARLES HILL PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SHERRY HILL; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; THERE ARE NO MINOR CHILDREN OF THIS MARRIAGE.; THERE IS NO COMMUNITY PROPERTY SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT.; THERE ARE NO COMMUNITY DEBTS SUBJECT TO DISPOSITION BY THE COURT.; SPOUSAL SUPPORT IS KNOWINGLY AND INTELLIGENTLY WAIVED BY CHARLES HILL.; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY SHERRY HILL ON 11/17/10; BY FILING OF SERVICE OF PROCESS.; DECREE OF LEGAL SEPARATION GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; ACTION - COMPLETE; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2010

DocketDECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON SHERRY HILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2010

DocketREQUEST TO SET UNCONTESTED MATTER RE: LEGAL SEPERATION FILED BY CHARLES HILL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2010

DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SHERRY HILL FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2010

DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON LEGAL SEPARATION NO CHILDREN FILED 11/05/2010 OF CHARLES HILL AS TO SHERRY HILL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2010

DocketCASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM FAM/NSNS1000054

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2010

DocketANSWER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NO PROOF OF SERVICE & NO FILING FEE PAID.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2010

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON SHERRY HILL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/17/10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CHARLES HILL IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketFILING FEE WAIVED ON CHARLES HILL FOR FIRST PAPER FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketFAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketREQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CHARLES HILL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketFAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less