This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 23:59:03 (UTC).

CHARLES EDWARD MOSSO

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 CHARLES EDWARD MOSSO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0885

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BARBARA J GILMORE

Decedent

CHARLES EDWARD MOSSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NASSAR, WILLIAM M

Po Box 2323

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - CAROL A. GEVING FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - CAROL A. GEVING FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

ORDER SETTLING REPORT ON WVR OF ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

ORDER SETTLING REPORT ON WVR OF ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES AND SUPPLEMENT TO REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCT FILED.

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES AND SUPPLEMENT TO REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCT FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCTING FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF REPORT ON WAIVER OF ACCTING FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE.

HRG OF 09/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/26/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBIUTION AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE

PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBIUTION AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE

NOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE.

NOTICE TO DIRECTOR OF FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED.

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 12/19/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PETITION FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED.

RESPONSE TO PROBATE EXAMINERS NOTES FILED.

HRG OF 10/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 10/17/16 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - CAROL A. GEVING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS - WILLIAM M. NASSAR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX-PARTE PET. FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION - BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY BARBARA J GILMORE FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180221-0391 $6.00; 180221-0391-MC Reference Number 031-0088040324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING REPORT ON WVR OF ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF BARBARA J. GILMORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBIUTION AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF BARBARA J GILMORE AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM NASSAR PRESENT FOR BARBARA GILMORE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROBATE NOTE REGARDING THE I & A IS CLEARED ON; THE RECORD.; WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 10/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY BARBARA J GILMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL RECEIPT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLINATION OF CO-EXECUTOR AND NOMINATION OF SOLE EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160902-0807 $465.00; 160902-0807-CK Reference Number 12247

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.