This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 14:26:46 (UTC).

CHANG YUM-V-MARIO ARTEAGA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2017 CHANG YUM-V-MARIO ARTEAGA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0518

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG YUM

Defendants

MECHELLE ARTEAGA

MARIO ARTEAGA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF REBECCA HUFFORD-COHEN

433 North Camden Dr Ste 600

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 < $25,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF CHANG YUM ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CHANG YUM; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/09/17 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/09/17 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MECHELLE ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MECHELLE ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/09/17

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0651 $255.00; 170309-0651-CK Reference Number 44504

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • WRIT MAILED TO ATTY IN SASE THIS DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170328-0028 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 <$25,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF CHANG YUM AS TO MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 < $25,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF CHANG YUM ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CHANG YUM; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIO ARTEAGA, MECHELLE ARTEAGA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIO ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON 03/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MECHELLE ARTEAGA; PARTY SERVED ON 03/09/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT >$10,000 <$25,000 FILED 03/09/2017 OF CHANG YUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CHANG YUM FOR ADDITIONAL FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0673 $140.00; 170309-0673-CK Reference Number 44504

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 03/02/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM UDRL TO UDMRL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $12,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170309-0651 $255.00; 170309-0651-CK Reference Number 44504

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.