This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:30:57 (UTC).

CHALLENGE VS. PADILLA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CHALLENGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PADILLA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8318

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendant

ERIC JOVANI PADILLA

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0031 $100.00; 171030-0031-CK Reference Number 086088

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC JOVANI PADILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC JOVANI PADILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180221-0014 $25.00; 180221-0014-CK Reference Number 089780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ERIC JOVANI PADILLA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:48; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ERIC JOVANI PADILLA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ERIC JOVANI PADILLA.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERIC JOVANI PADILLA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $100.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,600.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:51; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC JOVANI PADILLA. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0031 $100.00; 171030-0031-CK Reference Number 086088

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less