This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:29:59 (UTC).

CHALLENGE -V- SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CHALLENGE -V- SANCHEZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8312

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendants

DANIEL SANCHEZ

JASMINE SANCHEZ

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JASMINE SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JASMINE SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:35; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $140.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,640.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); THE COURT ORDERS THE LIABILITY OF EACH PARTY/PERSON JOINT AND SEVERAL.; 10:30; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0033 $100.00

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180221-0005 $25.00; 180221-0005-CK Reference Number 003659

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:35; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL SANCHEZ, JASMINE SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $140.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,640.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); THE COURT ORDERS THE LIABILITY OF EACH PARTY/PERSON JOINT AND SEVERAL.; 10:30; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO DANIEL SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/02/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JASMINE SANCHEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 12/07/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0033 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less