This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:30:11 (UTC).

CHALLENGE -V- RUBIO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CHALLENGE -V- RUBIO was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8313

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendant

ROLANDO A RUBIO

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROLANDO A RUBIO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:38; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ROLANDO A RUBIO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ROLANDO A RUBIO.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROLANDO A RUBIO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,595.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:41; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROLANDO A RUBIO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROLANDO A RUBIO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0038 $100.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2018
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FORWARD AS TO ROLANDO A RUBIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ROLANDO A RUBIO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:38; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; ROLANDO A RUBIO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ROLANDO A RUBIO.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROLANDO A RUBIO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,595.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:41; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ROLANDO A RUBIO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0038 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less