This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:30:19 (UTC).

CHALLENGE -V- LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CHALLENGE -V- LOPEZ was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8314

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHALLENGE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Defendants

SANTIAGO LOPEZ

JOSEFINA REYES

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:41; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $150.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,650.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); THE COURT ORDERS THE LIABILITY OF EACH PARTY/PERSON JOINT AND SEVERAL.; 10:44; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO SANTIAGO LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO SANTIAGO LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0044 $100.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO SANTIAGO LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO SANTIAGO LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( COUNTER ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 180221-0028 $25.00; 180221-0028-CK Reference Number 089784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHYRILL INCIONG; BAILIFF: J RODRIGUEZ; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:41; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; LUIS VILLAGRANA IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; EXHIBIT(S) RETURNED TO PARTIES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES.; JUDGMENT FOR: CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SANTIAGO LOPEZ, JOSEFINA REYES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $150.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,650.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); THE COURT ORDERS THE LIABILITY OF EACH PARTY/PERSON JOINT AND SEVERAL.; 10:44; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CHALLENGE FINANCIALSERVICES, INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO SANTIAGO LOPEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLA CLAIM FILED AS TO JOSEFINA REYES. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0044 $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less