This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:47:44 (UTC).

CERVANTEZ VS VERSANES/ARTEAGA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CERVANTEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERSANES/ARTEAGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0972

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRANK CERVANTEZ

Defendants

NAZARIO ARTEAGA

MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FRANK CERVANTEZ; DEFENDANT NAZARIO ARTEAGA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO PLAINTIFF.; 10:37; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO NAZARIO ARTEAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO NAZARIO ARTEAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO NAZARIO ARTEAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO NAZARIO ARTEAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 05/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:36; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: FRANK CERVANTEZ; DEFENDANT NAZARIO ARTEAGA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO PLAINTIFF.; 10:37; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO NAZARIO ARTEAGA. PARTY SERVED ON 02/08/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MARIE JENNIFER VERSANES. PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0260 $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less