This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 09:25:20 (UTC).

CERVANTES VS JIMENEZ

Case Summary

On 08/30/2010 CERVANTES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JIMENEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0491

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL U CERVANTES

Defendant

MIKI JIMENEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • WRIT FEE WAIVED PER FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED AT WINDOW FOR PICK UP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/30/2010 OF MICHAEL CERVANTES ORDERED ENTERED 09/08/10; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL U CERVANTES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIKI JIMENEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MIKI JIMENEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIKI JIMENEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/30/2010 OF MICHAEL CERVANTES AS TO MIKI JIMENEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MIKI JIMENEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 08/30/10 (UD).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF FEE WAIVER-GRANTED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL U CERVANTES FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $235.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL U CERVANTES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL U CERVANTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.