This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 19:22:43 (UTC).

CERVANTES -V- THE RAYMOND CORP. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 CERVANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE RAYMOND CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3668

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVE CERVANTES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ANTHONY VIRGIN

THE RAYMOND CORPORATION

ANTHONY VIRGEN

CTDI TIME WARNER

COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.,

ADECCO USA, INC.

ADECCO USA,INC.

RAYMOND HANDLING SOLUTIONS

ROES 1 THROUGH 50,INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ANTHONY VIRGEN

ADECCO USA, INC.

COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHUDACOFF, SIMON &FRIEDMAN, LLP

12100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8557

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8558

LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK

3 Park Plaza Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614-8558

LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP

12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OFF CAL FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STEVE CERVANTES.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STEVE CERVANTES.

DECLARATION OF LOUIS CALLEA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMM JUDG FILED

DECLARATION OF LOUIS CALLEA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMM JUDG FILED

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY THE RAYMOND CORPORATION.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA CTS ISO THEIR MOTION FILED.

DEFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FA CTS ISO THEIR MOTION FILED.

DECLARATION OF DAVID MULLEN ISO MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF DAVID MULLEN ISO MSJ FILED

ANSWER FILED BY ADECCO USA, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY ADECCO USA, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LIEDLE, LASRRSON, LIDL & VAIL,LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADECCO USA,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/08/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADECCO USA,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/08/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF ANTHONY VIRGEN NAMING ROES 2 TO BE THE RAYMOND CORPORATION FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/20/2016 OF ANTHONY VIRGEN NAMING ROES 2 TO BE THE RAYMOND CORPORATION FILED

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/09/2016 OF STEVE CERVANTES BY COMMUNICATIONS TESTDESIGN, INC.,

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/09/2016 OF STEVE CERVANTES BY COMMUNICATIONS TESTDESIGN, INC.,

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ANTHONY VIRGEN.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH KOELLER, NEBEKER, CARLSON & HALUCK, LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ANTHONY VIRGEN.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY VIRGEN SERVED ON 04/05/16 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ANTHONY VIRGEN SERVED ON 04/05/16 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/03/16 AS TO STEVE CERVANTES, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 05/03/16 AS TO STEVE CERVANTES, FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT R BRUCATO; APPEARANCES:; DOUGLAS FRIEDMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEVE CERVANTES.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: DISMISSAL BEING CIRCULATED FOR SIGNATURES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY STEVE CERVANTES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT (1.19.18) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE RAYMOND CORPORATION; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • 4/5/18 MSJ OFF CALENDAR PER ATTY INGOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE RAYMOND CORPORATION, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVE CERVANTES FOR POSTAGE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160315-0303 $0.71; 160315-0303-VS Reference Number 023-0252327585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVE CERVANTES FOR COPY FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160315-0302 $2.00; 160315-0302-VS Reference Number 023-0252327585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVE CERVANTES FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160315-0299 $10.00; 160315-0299-VS Reference Number 023-0252327585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY STEVE CERVANTES FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 160315-0298 $435.00; 160315-0298-VS Reference Number 023-0252327585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.