This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 14:31:02 (UTC).

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION -V- WAYNE LHOMMEDIEU

Case Summary

On 10/28/2010 CEMEX CONSTRUCTION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WAYNE LHOMMEDIEU. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1669

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONMATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PRITI DESAI

CROWN POOLS,INC

NIMESH DESAI

WAYNE R LHOMMEDIEU

Cross Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

CROWN POOLS INC

ARMOND MICHAEL CORONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALSH & WALSH

420 Exchange Suite 270

Irvine, CA 92602

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF AARON R. SALO

20955 Pathfinder Rd, Ste 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2051
  • SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE NIMESH DESAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2051
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT PRITI DESAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2051
  • SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE PRITI DESAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2051
  • SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT NIMESH DESAI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/STATUS OF 585 JUDGMENT PACKET; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • CASE TRACKED TO JUDGMENT SHELF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/28/2010 OF CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONMATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/28/2010 OF CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONMATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/23/12; JUDGMENT FOR: CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONMATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WAYNE R LHOMMEDIEU; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,710.95 INTEREST $604.80 ATTORNEY FEES $321.09 COSTS $462.44 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,099.28; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF 585D FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MARK A WALSH FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO NIMESH DESAI SERVED ON 11/14/10 WITH FEES OF $60.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CROWN POOLS,INC SERVED ON 12/03/10 WITH FEES OF $71.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO WAYNE R LHOMMEDIEU SERVED ON 11/14/10 WITH FEES OF $60.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PRITI DESAI SERVED ON 11/14/10 WITH FEES OF $30.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • ANSWER-CONTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ANSWER INCOMPLETE-COMPLETE RED CHECKED ITEMS, NEED TO MAIL COPY OF ANSWER AND PROVI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 101028-0561 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/28/2010 OF CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONMATERIALS PACIFIC, LLC - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.