This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 03:38:34 (UTC).

CELLI -V- URESTE

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 CELLI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against URESTE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1515

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARILYN C CELLI

Defendant

ALICIA URESTE

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PETITIONER OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO VACATE PLACED IN FILE

PETITIONER OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO VACATE PLACED IN FILE

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:06; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARILYN C CELLI PRESENT; DEFENDANT ALICIA URESTE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; ALICIA URESTE'S MOTION TO VACATE IS HEARD.; ALICIA URESTE'S MOTION TO VACATE IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 08/31/2017 OF MARILYN CELLI.; STIPULATED JUDGMENT FILED.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT FOR: MARILYN C CELLI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALICIA URESTE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,000.00; MONEY JUDGMENT SHALL BE PAID AT THE RATE OF $100.00 PER MONTH BEGINNING 01/30/18. EACH PAYMENT THEREAFTER SHALL BE DUE ON THE 30TH DAY OF EACH FOLLOWING MONTH.; IF THE DEFENDANT SHOULD DEFAULT ON ANY TERMS OF THIS AGREEMENT, THE ENTIRE JUDGMENT SHALL BECOME IMMEDIATELY DUE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY ALICIA URESTE.

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY ALICIA URESTE.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARILYN C CELLI PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ALICIA URESTE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY MARILYN CELLI.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ALICIA URESTE.; JUDGMENT FOR ALICIA URESTE.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 12/22/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,788.26 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,918.26; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO ALICIA URESTE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO ALICIA URESTE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 12/30/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 11/01/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC OF RULING RECEIVED BACK FROM ALICIA URESTE/UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT; THE COURTS RULING IS AS FOLLOWS: MOTION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 12/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITIONER OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO VACATE PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY ALICIA URESTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 10/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:59; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MARILYN C CELLI PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE.; ALICIA URESTE HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY MARILYN CELLI.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ALICIA URESTE.; JUDGMENT FOR ALICIA URESTE.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 12/22/17; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,788.26 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $130.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,918.26; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF CLAIM FILED AS TO ALICIA URESTE. PARTY SERVED ON 09/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARILYN C CELLI FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170901-0069 $75.00; 170901-0069-CK Reference Number 12695

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.