This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 12:53:50 (UTC).

CCR INVESTMENT GROUP -V- DANIEL MORENO

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 CCR INVESTMENT GROUP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL MORENO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1288

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CCR INVESTMENT GROUP

Defendants

YENI VALENCIA

DANIEL MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM N ELDER, JR

3818 E. La Palma Ave

Anaheim, CA 92807

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISIFED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISIFED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

DECLARATION OF RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION OF RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $38.47)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $38.47)

DECLARATION OF SUPPORT OF COSTS OF ENFORCING JUDGMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF SUPPORT OF COSTS OF ENFORCING JUDGMENT FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CCR INVESTMENT GROUP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL MORENO, YENI VALENCIA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $7,699.69 INTEREST $254.41 ATTORNEY FEES $919.97 COSTS $487.52 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $9,361.59; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: PRE JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED BY CCR INVESTMENT GROUP

DECLARATION RE: PRE JUDGMENT INTEREST FILED BY CCR INVESTMENT GROUP

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DANIEL MORENO, YENI VALENCIA.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DANIEL MORENO, YENI VALENCIA.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YENI VALENCIA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YENI VALENCIA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANIEL MORENO SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANIEL MORENO SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171026-0738 $380.00; 171026-0738-CK Reference Number 15331

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CCR INVESTMENT GROUP FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180227-0176 $25.00; 180227-0176-CK Reference Number 15840

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 9575.06 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180222-0798 $25.00; 180222-0798-CK Reference Number CK 15836

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISIFED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180205-0597 $25.00; 180205-0597-CK Reference Number CK 15675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( 9575.06 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 9575.06 )

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/26/2017 OF CCR INVESTMENT GROUP AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO YENI VALENCIA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DANIEL MORENO SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $53.76.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM CIV/DSDS1721288

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 171026-0738 $380.00; 171026-0738-CK Reference Number 15331

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less