This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:25:11 (UTC).

CBB-V-ROSALES

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 CBB-V-ROSALES was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9160

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC.

Defendants

LUIS ROSALES

SONIA ROSALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 So Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FILED

JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. ORDERED ENTERED 12/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUIS ROSALES, SONIA ROSALES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,220.98 INTEREST $816.50 ATTORNEY FEES $572.00 COSTS $327.40 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,936.88; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS ROSALES, SONIA ROSALES.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON LUIS ROSALES, SONIA ROSALES.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS ROSALES SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $78.45.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LUIS ROSALES SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $78.45.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SONIA ROSALES SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $52.95.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO SONIA ROSALES SERVED ON 10/13/17 WITH FEES OF $52.95.

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180328-0742 $25.00; 180328-0742-CK Reference Number CK 087337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 6257.61 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $136.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $159.73)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180122-0812 $25.00; 180122-0812-CK Reference Number 086926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. ORDERED ENTERED 12/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUIS ROSALES, SONIA ROSALES; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,220.98 INTEREST $816.50 ATTORNEY FEES $572.00 COSTS $327.40 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,936.88; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 09/27/2017 OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. AS TO LUIS ROSALES, SONIA ROSALES.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,220.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/21/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CALIFORNIA BUSINESSBUREAU INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0917 $196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less