This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 09:09:07 (UTC).

CAVALRY -V- RIVAS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CAVALRY -V- RIVAS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3288

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

PAUL T RIVAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle Suite #110

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAUL T RIVAS SERVED ON 07/26/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAUL T RIVAS SERVED ON 07/26/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180502-0166 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PAUL T RIVAS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,327.94 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,632.94; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1788.60(A) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON PAUL T RIVAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PAUL T RIVAS SERVED ON 07/26/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,327.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0079 $240.00; 170713-0079-CK Reference Number 016078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less