This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:39:23 (UTC).

CAVALRY-V-HERRERA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CAVALRY-V-HERRERA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1568

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

JUAN HERRERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN HERRERA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN HERRERA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUAN HERRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,625.53 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,125.53; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 03/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUAN HERRERA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,625.53 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,125.53; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JUAN HERRERA FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180305-0053 $240.00; 180305-0053-CK Reference Number #024741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180305-0048 $20.00; 180305-0048-CK Reference Number #024742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JUAN HERRERA SERVED ON 11/13/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0887 $240.00; 171031-0887-CK Reference Number 018629

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,625.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/30/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less