This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 02:50:50 (UTC).

CAVALRY -V- FRANCO

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 CAVALRY -V- FRANCO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7727

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF

Defendant

JESSE FRANCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESSE FRANCO SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESSE FRANCO SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF ORDERED ENTERED 06/21/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JESSE FRANCO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,682.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $315.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,997.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • ORDER ON DECLARATION RE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JESSE FRANCO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF AS TO JESSE FRANCO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT CCP1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DECLARATION OF APPLICATION OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESSE FRANCO SERVED ON 10/17/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,682.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0340 $240.00; 170915-0340-CK Reference Number 0757229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less