This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:36:50 (UTC).

CAVALRY-V-ASHBY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CAVALRY-V-ASHBY was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1553

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

JILLIAN ASHBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN N. WINN

110 E. Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JILLIAN ASHBY WITH COSTS OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JILLIAN ASHBY WITH COSTS OF $75.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180419-0358 $4.00; 180419-0358-MC Reference Number 033-0063876755

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • PLAINTIFFS DECL/ORDER RE OSC RESPONSE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): COURT DENIES PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR DEC & ORD FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0391 $20.00; 180405-0391-MC Reference Number 033-0061769338

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0388 $5.00; 180405-0388-MC Reference Number 033-0061769338

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JILLIAN ASHBY WITH COSTS OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,271.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0188 $240.00; 171031-0188-CK Reference Number 0764974

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less