This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:12:02 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV VS BOJORQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 CAVALRY SPV filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BOJORQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2051

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

JOSE R BOJORQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN N. WINN

110 E. Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/01/17; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE R BOJORQUEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,283.31 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $315.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,598.31; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT (CCP 1033) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF SUPP FO APP FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT CCP 1788.60(A) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSE R BOJORQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO JOSE R BOJORQUEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 01/31/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE R BOJORQUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/22/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0786 $240.00; 170203-0786-CK Reference Number 0720955

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.