This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:34:38 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV-V-SLEIMAN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CAVALRY SPV-V-SLEIMAN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1543

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

CHARIFE SLEIMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/11/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHARIFE SLEIMAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,403.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,708.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PER CCP 1788.60(A) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PER CCP 1788.60(A) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% FILED.

PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHARIFE SLEIMAN FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHARIFE SLEIMAN FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHARIFE SLEIMAN SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CHARIFE SLEIMAN SERVED ON 11/21/17 WITH FEES OF $65.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 04/11/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHARIFE SLEIMAN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,403.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,708.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF APP FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PER CCP 1788.60(A) FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO CHARIFE SLEIMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/30/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP SECTION 1033 FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF ATTORNEYS FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF SECURITY INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,403.58

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0958 $240.00; 171031-0958-CK Reference Number 019633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less