This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:11:31 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV-V-FRANCISCO RICO

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAVALRY SPV-V-FRANCISCO RICO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1748

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I,LLC,AS ASSIGNEE OF

Defendant

FRANCISCO RICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • EMPLOYERS RETURN PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 1276.39 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170825-0343 $25.00; 170825-0343-CK Reference Number 0754666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $70.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $120.06)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 1091.68 ); Minutes; Receipt: 160805-0354 $25.00; 160805-0354-CK Reference Number 0694318

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • ** VOID ** FEE FOR WRIT ISSUED AB145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $5.35)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST INSTRUMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FRANCISCO RICO SERVED ON 02/16/16 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I,LLC,AS ASSIGNEE OF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I,LLC,AS ASSIGNEE OF FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2713 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less