This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 12:11:47 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV-V-CHILDRESS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CAVALRY SPV-V-CHILDRESS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1750

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF

Defendant

RACHEL D CHILDRESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL HEARING INFORMATION IS INCORRECT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RACHEL D CHILDRESS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/14/16 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160204-2764 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less