This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:38:09 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC -V- GENEA E WASHINGTON

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC -V- GENEA E WASHINGTON was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3148

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF

Defendant

GENEA E WASHINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF ORDERED ENTERED 05/07/18; JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF; JUDGMENT AGAINST: GENEA E WASHINGTON; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ISO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDG.... FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND/OR LOST INSTRUMENT AND ORDR FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON GENEA E WASHINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF AS TO GENEA E WASHINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GENEA E WASHINGTON SERVED ON 12/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC,AS ASSIGNEEOF FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0278 $380.00; 170711-0278-CK Reference Number #6646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less