This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:46:08 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC -V- ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2483

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

Defendant

JUAN J ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle Suite #110

Fresno, CA 93720

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR QUALL CARDOT FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT JUAN ALVAREZ PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:13; DEFENDANT STATES HE IS NOT THE PERSON WHO OWES MONEY TO THE CREDIT CARD COMPANY. DEFENDANT; BELIEVES HE IS NOT THE PERSON WHO SHOULD BE SUED. COURT SETS TRIAL DATE AND ADVISES; DEFENDANT TO ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE THE CONFUSION WITH CREDIT CARD COMPANY.; TRIAL DATE SET BY THE COURT AS FOLLOWS:; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 HOURS; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC IS SET FOR 01/19/18 AT 10:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; 09:17; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JUAN J ALVAREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JUAN J ALVAREZ FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/21/17 AS TO QUAL CARDOT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • ANSWER FILED BY JUAN J ALVAREZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JUAN J ALVAREZ WITH COSTS OF $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: STATEMENT OF VENUE FILED BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170210-0320 $240.00; 170210-0320-CK Reference Number 012277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.