This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 22:33:18 (UTC).

CATHY DAVIS -N- RON DAVIS

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 CATHY DAVIS -N- RON DAVIS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1305

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATHY DAVIS

Claimants

YOUNGS MARKET COMPANY/RETIREMENT ACCOUNT

NEW YORK LIFE DISTRIBUTORS,LLC/401K PLAN

Respondent

RON DAVIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HILKE, JANIS L

14350 Civic Drive Suite 150

Victorville, CA 92392

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OAHG BY MAIL ON 07/12/11 AS TO RON DAVIS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQ FOR PROD OF DOCS, FORM INTERROGATORIES,SAD BY MAIL ON 07/12/11 AS TO RON DAVIS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2011
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 06/06/11 IN DEPT V12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • OAHG RECD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS JOINDER FILED AS TO RON DAVIS, YOUNGS MARKET COMPANY/RETIREMENT ACCOUNT. PARTY SERVED ON 06/06/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • ATTACHMENT TO 06/06/11 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: AF/SS/OTHER:HEALTH INSUR/HOUSEHOLD ITEMS (051211) FILED BY CATHY DAVIS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DEBRA HARRIS, JUDGE; CLERK: CAROLYN JOHNSON; COURT REPORTER DENISE STAKES 12539; BAILIFF: REED POWELL; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER CATHY DAVIS PRESENT; ATTORNEY JANIS L HILKE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT RON DAVIS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; OSC/MOTION HELD.; WITNESS -- CATHY DAVIS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- RON DAVIS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL REPORT GIVEN BY MS. HILKE.; COURT FINDS:; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE DODGE DYNASTY IS NOT AN ISSUE AS THE VEHICLE HAS BEEN REPAIRED.; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE PARTIES HAVE AN AGREEMENT TO THE DISPURSEMENT OF THE HOUSEHOLD; FURNISHINGS.; THE COURT FINDS RESPONDENT WILL KEEP PETITIONER ON ALL INSURANCE CURRENTLY IN EFFECT.; THE COURT ORDERS PETITIONER TO LOOK FOR GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT.; THE COURT ORDERS PETITIONER NOTIFY RESPONDENT WITHIN 5 COURT DAYS OF RECIEVING GAINFUL; EMPLOYMENT.; SUPPORT ORDERS:; SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED.; RON DAVIS IS ORDERED TO PAY AS AND FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT THE SUM OF $2,441.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 05/15/11 AND CONTINUING UN; TIL THE DEATH OF EITHER PARTY, REMARRIAGE OF THE CATHY DAVIS OR:; FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT; MS. HILKE TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR JOINDER/SUMMONS/PLEADING JOINDER BY MAIL ON 05/17/11 AS TO NEW YORK LIFE DISTRIBUTORS,LLC, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OSC,APP/DEC,DEC,IE,BLANK ANSWER,PROCDR BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 05/17/11 AS TO RON DAVIS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RON DAVIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/12/11

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY CATHY DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PLEADING ON JOINDER -- EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PLEADING ON JOINDER -- EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON JOINDER. ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN AND ORDER. CLAIMANT IS YOUNGS MARKET COMPANY/RETIREMENT ACCOUNT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON JOINDER. ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR JOINDER OF EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN AND ORDER. CLAIMANT IS NEW YORK LIFE DISTRIBUTORS,LLC/401K PLAN.

    Read MoreRead Less