This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 20:32:47 (UTC).

CATHAY BANK -V- NARAYANKRUPA

Case Summary

On 03/25/2011 CATHAY BANK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NARAYANKRUPA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3024

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATHAY BANK

Claimant

SNYDER DRYWALL & DEVELOPMENT BY JENNIFER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NARAYANKRUPA, INC

ASHOK PATEL

JAYESHKUMAR JOSHI

STELIAN ONUFREI

RAVI PATEL

MAHENDRA PATEL

NARAYANKRUPA

MANILAL CHAUDHARI

Cross Defendants

NATIONAL BUILDERS CONTROL, INC

DIAMOND CONSTRUCTION & DESIGN

ADRIAN ONUFREI

STELIAN ONUFREI

ADRIAN O'BRIAN

Receiver

STEPHEN K POST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANDZEL ROBINS BLOOM & CSATO L.C.

1000 Wilshire Blvd 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2427

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHEREN & ASSOCIATES

16055 Ventura Blvd Ste 525

Encino, CA 91436

CUCHER, ROB D

315 S Beverly Dr Ste 310

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

SATALINO, FRANK

19 Velarde Court

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SATALINO, FRANK

19 Velarde Court

Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688

WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2016
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT FROM ORANGE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED CANCELED FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED CANCELED FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • WRIT OF ATTACHMENT RETURNED CANCELED FROM ORANGE COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO DS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FROM LA COUNTY - UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • HEARING RE: STATUS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • MOTION RE: (10/24/13) TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT NARAYANKRUPA, INC; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: GABRIELA LEE; COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY 3981; COURT ATTENDANT D ANDRADE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPERANCE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
392 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2011
  • DECLARATION OF D.MICKELSON SUPPORT OF EX-PARTE APPLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • PLNTF.EX-PARTE APPL.,ORDER APPOINTING A RECEIVER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CATHAY BANK FOR EXPARTE; Minutes; Receipt: 110419-0902 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/25/2011 OF CATHAY BANK, RAVI PATEL, MAHENDRA PATEL, ASHOK PATEL, STELIAN ONUFREI, MANILAL CHAUDHARI, JAYESHKUMAR JOSHI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110325-3531 $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 03/25/2011 OF CATHAY BANK - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.