This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 20:38:23 (UTC).

CASTRO VS DRYDEN

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 CASTRO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DRYDEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8083

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RAYMOND CASTRO

SHIRLEY CASTRO

Defendant

ERIC DRYDEN

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0418 $50.00; 171030-0418-DB Reference Number 031-0055517907

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC DRYDEN. PARTY SERVED ON 12/01/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC DRYDEN. PARTY SERVED ON 12/01/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • ASOJ RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 01/05/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF SHIRLEY CASTRO ORDERED ENTERED 01/03/18; JUDGMENT FOR: SHIRLEY CASTRO, RAYMOND CASTRO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERIC DRYDEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,093.86 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $50.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3,143.86; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: S WADDY; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY CASTRO, RAYMOND CASTRO PRESENT; DEFENDANT ERIC DRYDEN PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 11:10; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- SHIRLEY CASTRO IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- ERIC DRYDEN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ROSIE RODRIGUEZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION.; 11:53; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/29/17 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT F7.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO ERIC DRYDEN. PARTY SERVED ON 12/01/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0649 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0418 $50.00; 171030-0418-DB Reference Number 031-0055517907

    Read MoreRead Less