This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:36:09 (UTC).

CASTILLE -V- CITIBANK

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 CASTILLE filed an Other lawsuit against CITIBANK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2154

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONA CASTILLE

Defendant

CITIBANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF L. PAUL MANKIN

4655 Cass St Ste 112

San Diego, CA 92109

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL D SCHULMAN

18757 Burbank Blvd, Ste 310

Tarzana, CA 91356-3375

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MATTER IS SET FOR A HEARINGRE: STATUS OF REMOVAL OCTOBER 30,2017 AT; 08:30AM IN DEPARTMENT S17 LOCATED AT THE SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER LOCATED AT:; 247 WEST THIRD STREET SAN BERNARDINO CA 92415

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CITIBANK, N.A.. FEDERAL NUMBER UNKNOWN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF MONA CASTILLE FOR CITIBANK, N.A., ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL D SCHULMAN ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MONA CASTILLE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MONA CASTILLE FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0357 $12.00; 170207-0357-VS Reference Number 026-0004856992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MONA CASTILLE FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0355 $240.00; 170207-0355-VS Reference Number 026-0004856992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.