Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/19/2018 at 21:30:08 (UTC).

CASTANEDA -V- STATE OF CA

Case Summary

On 07/15/2015 CASTANEDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE OF CA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0352

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

DAVID CASTANEDA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA - DEPARTMENT OF TRANS

SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC

SONJA AIDA MORRIS MEEKS

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC

PARSONS CORPORATION

COFFMAN/PARSONS, AJOINT VENURE

PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC

SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC.

Cross Plaintiff

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENTOF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

EWANISZYK LAW FIRM

14350 Civic Drive Ste 100

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN

21804 Cactus Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92518

SNYDER LAW, LLP

420 South Fairview Avenue Suite 102

Santa Barbara, CA 93117

YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH

355 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

SNYDER LAW, LLP

420 South Fairview Avenue Suite 102

Santa Barbara, CA 93117

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF, WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO PLA IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS; THIS CASE IS CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVDS1503077 AND THAT IS THE MASTER FILE, MOTION CAN NOT; BE FILED ON A CLOSED CASE HAS TO BE FILED UNDER MASTER CASE CIVDS1503077

NOTICE OF HEARING (6-27-16) FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

NOTICE OF HEARING (6-27-16) FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

ANSWER FILED BY SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC., SONJA AIDA MORRIS MEEKS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER LAW, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC., SONJA AIDA MORRIS MEEKS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER LAW, LLP.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ANSWER FILED BY SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC, SONJA AIDA MORRIS MEEKS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER LAW, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SAMMS ENTERPRISES,INC, SONJA AIDA MORRIS MEEKS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER LAW, LLP.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/15/2015 OF DAVID CASTANEDA BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/15/2015 OF DAVID CASTANEDA BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS.

ANSWER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN.

ANSWER FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WOOD SMITH HENNING& BERMAN.

ANSWER FILED BY COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC, COFFMAN/PARSONS, AJOINT VENURE, PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH.

ANSWER FILED BY COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC, COFFMAN/PARSONS, AJOINT VENURE, PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY YUKEVICH CAVANAUGH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/11/16 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON STATE OF CALIFORNIA- DEPARTMENT OF TRANS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/11/16 WITH COSTS OF $95.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR DAVID CASTANEDA IS 0001 -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR DAVID CASTANEDA IS 0001 -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY BRIAN S MCCARVILLE.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE/CIVDS1503077 FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE/CIVDS1503077 FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2016 OF STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF FILED BY STATE OF CALIFORNIADEPARTMENTOF, WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE IS CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVDS1503077 COMPLAINT FILED ON 4/25/16 HAS BEEN COM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO PLA IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS; THIS CASE IS CONSOLIDATED WITH CIVDS1503077 AND THAT IS THE MASTER FILE, MOTION CAN NOT; BE FILED ON A CLOSED CASE HAS TO BE FILED UNDER MASTER CASE CIVDS1503077

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVDS1503077 MASTER FILE CIVDS1503077; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- CONSOLIDATED.; DISPOSITION: CONSOLIDATION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/STATUS OF STIP TO CONSOLIDATE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; WALTER HOGAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID CASTANEDA.; ATTORNEY KEITH SMITH PRESENT FOR STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION.; ATTORNEY NOUSHAN NOUREDDINI PRESENT FOR COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC. ET., AL..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL REPORT THAT A STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS MATTER WITH RELATED CASE CIVDS1503077 HAS; BEEN SUBMITTED TO JUDGE FOSTER FOR REVIEW.; COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS:; ACTION CONSOLIDATED PHYSICALLY WITH CIVDS1503077 -- CASE # CIVDS1503077 DEEMED MASTER FILE.; ALL FUTURE HEARINGS ARE TO HELD IN DEPT. S22 BEFORE JUDGE BRYAN FOSTER.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (6-27-16) FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • FILE RETAINED IN S30 FOR HEARING ON 06/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SERVICE/STATUS OF STIP TO CONSOLIDATE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER ROCIO GONZALEZ 10911; COURT ATTENDANT A DIAZ; APPEARANCES:; WALTER J. HOGAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAVID CASTANEDA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL INDICATES A STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE IS STILL IN PROGRESS AND A HEARING IS SCHEDULED IN; ANOTHER FOR 06/27/16.; COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER TO BE ON 06/27/16 AFTER THE HEARING IN THE OTHER DEPARTMENT.; COUNSEL TO REPORT TO S30 AFTER HEARING AND PROVIDE STATUS OF CONSOLIDATION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/27/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • FILE SENT TO S30 FOR 06/14 HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE/CIVDS1503077 FILED BY DAVID CASTANEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • PLAINTIFF DAVID CASTANEDA FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID CASTANEDA FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150722-0824 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID CASTANEDA FOR FAX FILING SUMMONS/COMPLAINT; Minutes; Receipt: 150722-0825 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where PARSONS TRUSTEE, PETER S is a litigant

Latest cases where PARSONS TRANSPORTATION GROUP is a litigant