This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 14:31:44 (UTC).

Casillas-v-turner, Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by Casillas-v-turner in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2399

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grechel Casillas

Defendants

Michelle Monique Mclaughlin

All Others In Possession

Nicholas Antoine Turner

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE & STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/12/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE & STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/12/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE & STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/12/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: QUASH SERVICE & STRIKE COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 10/12/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN (IMAGED)

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

ORDER DENIED * FILED

ORDER DENIED * FILED

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT PLACED IN P/P BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ORIG WRIT PLACED IN P/P BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0765 $25.00; 171030-0765-CK Reference Number 1642

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN, ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN; PARTY SERVED ON 09/27/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR GRECHEL CASILLAS.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR GRECHEL CASILLAS.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY GRECHEL CASILLAS.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY GRECHEL CASILLAS.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR GRECHEL CASILLAS.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH BARRY LEE O'CONNOR& ASSOCIATES AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR GRECHEL CASILLAS.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0522 $255.00; 170927-0522-CK Reference Number 1641

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENIED * FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT,QUASH WRIT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF GRECHEL CASILLAS PRESENT; DEFENDANT NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR EX-PARTE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/QUASH WRIT.; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:37; NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER'S MOTION EX-PARTE TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT/QUASH WRIT IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRECHEL CASILLAS FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 171107-0029 $8.00; 171107-0029-DB Reference Number 026-0077259716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER, MICHELLE MONIQUE MCLAUGHLIN FOR FAX IN THE AMOUNT OF $22.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT,QUASH WRIT TO BE HEARD ON 11/07/17 AT 08:36 IN DEPARTMENT B4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 09/27/2017 OF GRECHEL CASILLAS; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • WRIT FWD TO S.C.S W/INSTRUCTIONS S

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NICHOLAS ANTOINE TURNER IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $41.67.--BEGINNING ON 10/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0522 $255.00; 170927-0522-CK Reference Number 1641

    Read MoreRead Less