This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 12:58:09 (UTC).

CASHCALL VS DAVIDSON

Case Summary

On 10/06/2010 CASHCALL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIDSON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0991

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC

Defendant

DAVID DAVIDSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2011
  • DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR RECEIVED FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. WRIT OF EXECUTION AND MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DAVID DAVIDSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DAVID DAVIDSON; Minutes; BANKRUPTCY # 6:11-BK-16608-SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( SENT TO ATTY VIA SASE ); Minutes; Receipt: 110315-0585 $25.00; 110315-0585-CK Reference Number 086914

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $19.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CASHCALL INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/02/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (RESET); Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; ARTHUR A HARRISON, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; CASHCALL INC REPRESENTED BY DANIELLE GREEN.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DAVID DAVIDSON; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; DAVID DAVIDSON NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; DANIELLE GREEN IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION, BY THE COURT,; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST DAVID DAVIDSON.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT CASHCALL INC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM DAVID DAVIDSON:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,749.47 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $145.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,894.47; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF CASHCALL INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2010
  • WRITTEN REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING IS GRANTED, AS REQUESTED BY DAVID DAVIDSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2010
  • ALL PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR IN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HRG RECVD AND SENT TO HEARING OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID DAVIDSON FOR CONTINUANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 101118-2183 $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO DAVID DAVIDSON. PARTY SERVED ON 11/04/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $45.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • DANIELLE WEATHERSBY /CASHCALL CAME IN TO RESET THEY NEED MORE TIME TO SERVE DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • COPY OF SC100 PLACED AT WINDOW NO SASE ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 101006-2446 $100.00; 101006-2446-CK Reference Number 082392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.